Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Ali, D. Barnes, Conaway, Gibson, Glenn, Haynes, R. Lewis, McIntosh, Queen, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State's Attorney for Baltimore City to appoint criminal investigators, subject to the approval of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City; authorizing the State's Attorney for Baltimore City to designate a chief investigator and assign other ranks and titles to other criminal investigators; authorizing a criminal investigator designated as a peace officer to arrest a certain person and service a warrant, summons or subpoena in Baltimore city; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0343
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1403 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {332018/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {332018/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM