Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates D.E. Davis, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Queen, and Valderrama
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain licensees to post a certain sign in a certain location; altering the minimum age, from 18 to 21, for an individual to purchase or be sold tobacco products; exempting certain individuals from a certain minimum age requirement for an individual to purchase or be sold tobacco products; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to conduct inspections of licensed retailers; authorizing the Department to use certain individuals under the age of 21 years to assist in conducting a certain inspection; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0895
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963691/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {633924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (36-88)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {553729/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (27-20)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-35)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {963691/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {633924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (36-88) 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Finance 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Floor Amendment {553729/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (27-20) 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (101-35) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16.5-214.1, 16.5-217.1, 16.7-101, 16.7-102, 16.7-201 through 16.7-204, 16.7-204.1, 16.7-206, 16.7-207, 16.7-209, 16.7-211, 16.7-213, 16.7-213.1, 16-209, 16-302, 16-308.2, 16-3A-01, 16-3A-02 )
(   10-101, 10-107, 10-108 )
(   13-1001, 13-1015, 24-305, 24-307 )
(   1-1201, 1-1203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM