Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a landlord who offers a dwelling unit for rent in the State under a rent-to-own agreement on or after October 1, 2017, to use a written lease; prohibiting a landlord from entering into or offering to enter into a rent-to-own agreement with a tenant except under specified circumstances; requiring a specified landlord to deliver a copy of a specified attorney certification to a prospective tenant together with a rent-to-own contract; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - Requirements
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301 )
(   8-201, 8-202, 8-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM