Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot Program; requiring the State Department of Education to develop and implement the Program in collaboration with specified entities; requiring specified circumstances to be met before the Program can be implemented; requiring each board of education to choose one high school football team to participate in the Program and to provide specified team members with a concussion impact sensor; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0426 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-433, 7-433.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM