Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the tax collector in Prince George's County to conduct a specified limited auction prior to conducting a public auction for property subject to tax liens; specifying the individuals who may participate in a limited auction; requiring a purchaser of property at a limited auction to occupy the property as the purchaser's principal residence; requiring the tax collector to include the date, time, and location of a limited auction in specified notices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {705762/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-4)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {705762/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-4) 62
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-817, 14-833 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM