Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Arentz, Beitzel, Cassilly, Folden, S. Howard, Krebs, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Parrott, Rose, Shoemaker, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Decreasing over a specified period of years the State corporate income tax rate from 8.25% to 6.25%.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
2/11/2016 Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page