Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing – Interstate Compact on Anti–Doping and Drug Testing Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser and Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Entering into the Interstate Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Compact; providing the purpose of the Compact is to facilitate joint action to create more uniform and effective breed specific rules on the permitted and prohibited use of drugs and medications for the welfare of the horse; establishing the Interstate Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Compact Commission to administer the Compact; providing for the composition, voting procedures, operation, and powers and duties of the Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1115
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Horse Racing – Interstate Compact on Anti–Doping and Drug Testing Standards
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Horse Racing – Interstate Compact on Anti–Doping and Drug Testing Standards
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Text - Chapter - Horse Racing – Interstate Compact on Anti–Doping and Drug Testing Standards
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM