Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to appoint a receiver under specified circumstances; providing that a specified mortgagee is entitled to the appointment of a receiver; requiring a court to appoint a receiver under specified circumstances; authorizing a court to condition the appointment of a receiver on the giving of a specified security under specified circumstances; authorizing a court to appoint a specified person as an ancillary receiver for specified property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0895
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-102, 15-103, 24-101 through 24-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM