Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Codifying the establishment of the Office of Security Management within the Department of Information Technology, the position of State Chief Information Security Officer, and the Maryland Cybersecurity Coordinating Council; altering the membership of the Council; requiring each unit of the Legislative or Judicial Branch of State government that uses a certain network to certify certain compliance to the Department on or before December 1 each year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Rules 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   21-2C-03 )
(   31-103 )
(   12-107, 3.5-101, 3.5-2A-01 through 3.5-2A-05, 3.5-301, 3.5-302, 3.5-303, 3.5-307, 3.5-309, 3.5-311, 3.5-404, 3.5-506, 3.5-602, 3A-101 through 3A-702 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page