Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Whistleblower Protections
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter and Anderson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a supervisor, an appointing authority, and the head of a law enforcement agency from threatening or taking specified retaliatory actions against a specified law enforcement officer under specified circumstances; authorizing a law enforcement officer aggrieved by a specified violation of the Act to file a civil action against a specified law enforcement agency for specified relief; authorizing that, instead of specified relief, the law enforcement officer may seek specified statutory damages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801 through 3-806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM