Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from renewing the driver's license of an individual who is at least 85 years old without requiring the individual to complete the renewal transaction in person except under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
(   16-115 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page