Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Renewable Energy Generating System - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Hucker, Stein, Clippinger, Aumann, Barnes, Carr, Glass, Guzzone, Hixson, Jameson, A. Kelly, Kramer, Luedtke, Mizeur, Morhaim, S. Robinson, A. Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program on community renewable energy generating systems under the authority of the Public Service Commission; stating when the pilot program will begin and terminate; providing for the structure and operation of the pilot program, including the generation of electricity and allocation of costs and credits to system subscribers; authorizing an electric company to submit a petition to own and operate a community renewable energy generating system to the Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0786
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM