Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Live Near Your Work Program - Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and McIntosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to report to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018, on the Department's evaluation of the ability of existing participants in the Live Near Your Work Program to increase their financial grants or incentives under the Program; and requiring the Department to submit this report as a one-time component of a certain annual report.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Housing and Community Development - Live Near Your Work Program - Report
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development - Live Near Your Work Program - Report
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Text - Chapter - Department of Housing and Community Development - Live Near Your Work Program - Report
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page