Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Tarrant, Howard, and Valderrama
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a food establishment, beginning March 1, 2015, to request that a customer inform the employee taking the customer's food order of any known food allergies before ordering; providing that the request may be included on a specified sign or a menu or menu board or made by the employee taking the customer's food order; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to make available on its Web site a list of specified food allergen awareness training courses and tests and a list of specified resources; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0409
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {326180/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-33)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments {326180/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (102-33) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1214, 21-330.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM