Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Adults With Autism Spectrum Disorder
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Acevero, Attar, Cain, Chang, Feldmark, Hill, Hornberger, Ivey, Jalisi, Lehman, Lierman, Patterson, Smith, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Adults with Autism Spectrum Disorder; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor, the Developmental Disabilities Administration, and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Adults With Autism Spectrum Disorder
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Task Force on Adults With Autism Spectrum Disorder
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM