Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance - Telepsychiatry - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering certain coverage and reimbursement requirements for psychiatric health care services delivered through telemedicine under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide coverage of and reimbursement for certain psychiatric health care services that are delivered through telepsychiatry; deeming a psychiatric health care service provided through telepsychiatry to be equivalent to a certain psychiatric health care service for a certain purpose; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance - Telepsychiatry - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance - Telepsychiatry - Requirements
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM