Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Animal Welfare - Instruction, Living Space, and Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that public and certain nonpublic schools provide instruction on the humane treatment and protection of companion, domestic, and wild animals; requiring a school that keeps a certain animal on the premises to provide an appropriate living space for the animal that meets certain standards; prohibiting an individual from feeding a live animal to another animal under certain circumstances; and requiring that an individual who violates a certain provision of law is guilty of a certain crime.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Animal Welfare - Instruction, Living Space, and Penalty
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-606 )
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page