Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Anderson, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Chang, Dumais, Gaines, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jackson, Jones, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Reznik, Sanchez, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the services to be provided by specified sexual assault crisis programs; specifying criteria for receiving specified grant funding; requiring the Governor to include a minimum of $3,000,000 each fiscal year in the State budget; authorizing the Governor, under specified circumstances, to reduce a specified appropriation; establishing the Maryland Sexual Assault Evidence Kit Policy and Funding Committee; requiring the Attorney General to adopt specified regulations in consultation with the Committee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0734
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244560/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-86)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
Text - First - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments {244560/1 Adopted 52
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-86) 52
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 53
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules 50
Senate 3/29/2017 3/30/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-923, 11-927 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM