Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Hammen, and Lierman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing in Baltimore City a Class D beer license to be issued to a holder of a Class 5 brewery license; specifying that the Class D beer license authorizes the license holder to sell at retail beer brewed on the premises for on-premises consumption; reducing the minimum amount of average daily food sale receipts from 65% to 51% for a restaurant for which a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license is issued; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to transfer a specified Class B-D-7 license to a specified location; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0561
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413898/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464530/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {413898/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {464530/1 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Passed Enrolled 71
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-1603, 12-1604, 12-1605, 12-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM