Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs – Physical Sports
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Ali, Hettleman, Jalisi, Lam, R. Lewis, McCray, Morhaim, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Education from approving physical sports as part of certain programs to be offered to certain students and requiring the revocation of certain previously approved programs; prohibiting certain students from participating in certain sports programs that include physical sports; providing for the construction of certain provisions of law regarding sports programs that include nonphysical sports; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education – Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs – Physical Sports
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-433, 7-433.1 )
(   14-501, 14-502, 14-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM