Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Morgan, Angel, B. Barnes, Barron, Beidle, Bromwell, Carey, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Davis, Grammer, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Impallaria, Jones, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, Krebs, J. Lewis, McDonough, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Valentino-Smith, West, K. Young, and Pendergrass
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to make a certain advance payment to a nursing home at the request of the nursing home for uncompensated Maryland Medical Assistance Program services provided to a certain resident; providing that the advance payment may not exceed 50% of the estimated amount due for the uncompensated services; requiring the Department to pay the balance due to a nursing home under certain circumstances; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0630
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1599 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576487/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {247372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {576487/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {247372/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Text - Chapter - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-149 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM