Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Braveboy, Carr, Gutierrez, and A. Kelly
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland; specifying the composition, powers, and duties of the Task Force; providing for the staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations, including suggested constitutional and legislative changes, to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2016.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1269 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM