Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Acevero, Hettleman, and Moon
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of certain regulations to prescribe and dispense aids for the cessation of the use of tobacco products; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2020, to adopt certain regulations; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program to provide coverage for certain services rendered by a licensed pharmacist under the Act to the same extent as certain services rendered by any other licensed health care practitioner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0497
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-101, 15-150 )
(   12-101, 12-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page