Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Mautz, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting Dorchester County from a requirement to revise its recycling plan by a specified date to address recycling at special events; and exempting Dorchester County from specified requirements regarding recycling at special events.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0392
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1703, 9-1712 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM