Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an apprentice hunting license that confers specified rights on a purchaser of the license; authorizing a person to obtain an apprentice hunting license on completion of a short online or electronic course of instruction in competency in firearms and hunter safety approved by the Department of Natural Resources; authorizing specified persons to hunt under an apprentice license only if accompanied and directly supervised by a person who is at least 18 years old and has a valid resident nonapprentice hunting license; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {140612/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-2)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable with Amendments {140612/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-2) 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM