Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Ali, Anderson, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Carr, Chang, Ciliberti, Clark, Clippinger, Dumais, Ebersole, Gaines, Glass, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jones, Kipke, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Mautz, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vogt, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Program to focus on preventing and ending youth homelessness in the State and addressing disparities based on race, ethnicity, sexual orientation, and gender identity; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the Program and provide funds to housing and supportive services for at risk and unaccompanied homeless youth; establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Fund to provide funds for the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1218
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824661/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {824661/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11.5-101 through 11.5-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page