Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Charitable Gaming Events - Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegate Stukes
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing in Baltimore City a nonprofit organization to hold a charitable gaming event under specified conditions; authorizing a charitable gaming event to include card games, dice games, and roulette; requiring that a nonprofit organization be issued a permit before conducting a charitable gaming event; allowing permit holders to pay for specified goods and services; making a violation of the Act a misdemeanor subject to specified penalties; making the Act contingent on the taking effect of another Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {765264/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {765264/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke) 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-501, 13-502, 13-505.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM