Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Swain, Anderson, Barkley, Braveboy, Burns, Davis, Glenn, Harper, Healey, Howard, McDonough, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Stocksdale, V. Turner, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, M. Washington, Weir, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the fine from $500 to $1,000 for a first violation of a specified prohibition relating to the delivery or sale of drug paraphernalia; prohibiting a person from committing a specified crime relating to the delivery or sale of drug paraphernalia in a specified school vehicle or in, on, or within 1,000 feet of specified real property used for elementary or secondary education; establishing a specified penalty for subsequent violations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0870
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-619, 5-627 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM