Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell (By Request - State Board of Pharmacy)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exception from the requirement that an individual be licensed by the Board of Pharmacy before the individual may practice pharmacy in the State; and requiring a dentist, physician, or podiatrist who dispenses a prescription drug or device in the course of treating a patient at a medical facility or clinic that specializes in the treatment of medical cases reimbursable through workers' compensation insurance to obtain a dispensing permit and meet other requirements.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0139
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM