Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Use of Headlights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegate Hucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that authorizes enforcement only as a secondary offense of a violation of the requirement that a driver of a vehicle on a highway use headlights during the continuous operation of the vehicle's windshield wipers under specified circumstances; and providing a penalty up to $500 for the violation.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-201.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM