Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission) and Delegates Beitzel, Frick, and Walker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the formula used to apportion income to the State for corporations that carry on a trade or business in and out of the State; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0842
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {825864/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {673023/1 Rejected (50-87)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {113328/1 Rejected (50-87)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {873425/1 Rejected (54-77)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {825864/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 47
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {673023/1 Rejected (50-87) 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {113328/1 Rejected (50-87) 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {873425/1 Rejected (54-77) 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM