Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates Costa, Afzali, Clagett, Cullison, Elliott, Frank, Hogan, Kipke, Krebs, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, Schulz, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that inspections of specified forensic laboratories be conducted with a specified frequency; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to authorize a specified accreditation body to inspect specified forensic laboratories in the State; requiring specified forensic laboratories to obtain accreditation from a specified accreditation body before applying for a specified license; requiring the Secretary to approve a specified nonprofit accreditation body to accredit forensic laboratories; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0242
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-2A-01, 17-2A-02, 17-2A-03.1, 17-2A-08, 17-2A-12 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM