Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0772
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM