Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Archivist - Process for Evaluating State Designations
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Cullison, Ebersole, Hill, Kelly, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the process by which the State Archivist reviews, evaluates, and makes recommendations to the General Assembly regarding specified State designations; providing that a specified provision of law does not affect the ability of the General Assembly to enact specified legislation; requiring the State Archivist to assist the General Assembly in reviewing and evaluating specified State designations; requiring the State Archivist to report annually an evaluation of any State designation to the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {706983/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {706983/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 61A
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 12:30 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1007, 9-1007.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM