Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman and Wells
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an individual have $300 of unpaid fines before qualifying to enter into a payment plan with the clerk of the court to pay certain overdue fines; requiring that a traffic citation provide certain notice that a person may be unable to have the person's driver's license or permit issued, reissued, or renewed under certain circumstances; clarifying the circumstances under which the Motor Vehicle Administration may charge a fee to an individual for certain registration renewal; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0925
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-204, 21-1128, 26-201, 26-204, 26-305, 27-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM