Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a standard to measure and quantify the student achievement gap, identify the student achievement gap between specified student groups, and issue best practices and annual benchmarks to close the student achievement gap between specified groups on or before July 1, 2018; requiring a local school system to document the student achievement gap in the district for the previous 20 years and develop a 5-year strategic plan to close the student achievement gap; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act)
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-204.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM