Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Bobo, Carter, Clippinger, Cluster, Eckardt, Gaines, Glass, Gutierrez, Hough, James, K. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, McDermott, Mitchell, Oaks, Rosenberg, Smigiel, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to serve in a fiduciary capacity for children in its custody; requiring the Department, in any action, service, or decision on behalf of a child in its custody, to protect and serve the best interest of the child; prohibiting the Department from imposing a debt obligation on a child in its custody or taking any other action that requires the child to pay for the child's own care or custody; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0914
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-527.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM