Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of Rights; vesting the final decision concerning an institution's membership or association with specified athletics organizations with the governing board of that institution; defining terms; specifying responsibilities for institutions of higher education and their athletic programs with regard to the student athletes; requiring the Secretary of Higher Education to make a certification; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0964
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104, 14-101, 14-104, 14-402, 14-404, 15-201 through 15-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM