Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear Violations
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, Mautz, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the offense of taking oysters with specified gear in specified areas that is subject to specified enhanced administrative penalties; and establishing the offense of taking oysters with a power dredge in specified areas that is subject to specified enhanced administrative penalties.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0390
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0918 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear Violations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear Violations
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM