Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Drug Overdose Deaths - Local Fatality Review Teams
Sponsored by
Delegates Schulz, Afzali, Aumann, Bates, Beitzel, Bromwell, Clagett, DeBoy, Elliott, Frank, George, Hogan, Hough, Kipke, McComas, McDermott, Myers, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Serafini, Stocksdale, Szeliga, A. Kelly, Krebs, Nathan-Pulliam, Ready, and Tarrant
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the establishment of a specified local drug overdose facility review team in each county; authorizing the establishment of a specified multicounty local team; providing for the composition, appointment of specified members, chair, and meetings of a local team; establishing that specified substance abuse treatment records are subject to additional limitations on disclosure or redisclosure; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {976785/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457773/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {976785/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {457773/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 58
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-306, 5-901 through 5-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM