Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising the Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act; identifying the Child Support Enforcement Administration as the support enforcement agency of the State; extending the application of specified provisions of the Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act to include parties, pleadings, proceedings, and support orders of a foreign country; authorizing a tribunal of this State to exercise jurisdiction over a guardian or conservator under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0941
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (133-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {842510/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (133-0) 53
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/27/2015 3/30/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/27/2015 3/27/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {842510/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 62
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301, 10-302, 10-303, 10-303.1, 10-304, 10-306, 10-307, 10-308, 10-309, 10-310, 10-311, 10-312, 10-312.1, 10-312.2, 10-313, 10-316, 10-317, 10-318, 10-319, 10-320, 10-322, 10-323, 10-325, 10-328, 10-329, 10-330, 10-331, 10-332, 10-332.1, 10-335 through 10-337, 10-339, 10-340, 10-341, 10-342, 10-343, 10-344, 10-345, 10-346, 10-347, 10-348, 10-349, 10-350, 10-353.1, 10-353.2, 10-354, 10-354 through 10-366, 10-355 through 10-359 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM