Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Pharmacy Networks - Plan
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Anderton, Fisher, Hornberger, Jacobs, Mautz, Otto, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, K. Young, Branch, Folden, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish a plan on or before September 1, 2015, to ensure that Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients enrolled in managed care organizations have reasonable access to pharmacy services in the event a managed care organization makes a change to its pharmacy network; requiring the plan to address specified standards needed to ensure access to specified pharmacy services; requiring the Department to submit the plan to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Adams) Adopted (132-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {656984/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {306280/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {927672/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Adams) Adopted (132-0) 53
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/27/2015 3/30/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2015 3/31/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {656984/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {306280/1 Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Rereferred to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {927672/1 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 65
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM