Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsored by
Delegate Hucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the licensure as a private process service agency of any person who provides specified private process service; providing for the terms and renewals of the licenses, qualifications for and duties of licensees, display of licenses, and required records of a licensee; establishing specified administrative, financial, and surety bond requirements for a licensed private process service agency; establishing qualifications for and duties of certified private process servers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13.5-101 through 13.5-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM