Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education and Health Occupations - Nurse Midwifery Program - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Kelly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore, in cooperation with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, the Johns Hopkins School of Nursing, and the State Board of Nursing to conduct a study and make recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013, regarding barriers and obstacles to establishing additional nurse midwifery programs in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0647
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM