Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Aumann and Frick
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a lender to elect to make a certain loan to a borrower under certain circumstances; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain loans under certain circumstances; prohibiting an unlicensed person from making a covered loan; providing that certain loans are void and unenforceable under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain persons from collecting or attempting to collect in a certain manner certain money or enforcing or attempting to enforce a certain contract in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853598/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {283693/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {387372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {853598/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {283693/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {387372/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-101.1, 12-111, 12-112, 12-114, 12-114.1, 12-301, 12-303, 12-311, 12-313, 12-314, 12-401, 12-402.1, 12-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM