Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Branch, Conaway, Harper, Oaks, Stukes, and Summers
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the court, in any case in which the court determines child support, to also consider custody and visitation of the child; and requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration to refer the parties to the court for purposes of considering custody and visitation of the child when the Administration establishes a child support obligation.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM