Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Carter, Ivey, Lee, Oaks, Rosenberg, and Valderrama
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute specified abandoned property funds each year to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund, rather than to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation; increasing from $500,000 to $1,500,000 the amount that the Comptroller is required to distribute; repealing provisions requiring the Governor to appropriate money each year to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0809
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614665/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-16)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {298975/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Delegates Guzzone, Zucker, and McConkey
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senators Frosh, Gladden, and Getty
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-8)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {614665/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (120-16) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {298975/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Delegates Guzzone, Zucker, and McConkey 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senators Frosh, Gladden, and Getty 62
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-8) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-317 )
(   11-401, 11-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM