Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Anderson, Dumais, Gibson, Glass, J. Lewis, Malone, McComas, Moon, Parrott, Proctor, Sanchez, Sydnor, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the circumstances under which the court is required to issue a certain permanent protective order; and requiring the court to issue a permanent protective order against a certain individual if, during the term of a certain protective order, the individual committed an act of abuse against a certain person eligible for relief under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0491
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM