Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Interrogation Right to Counsel - Suspension Period and Appointment
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Glenn, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified provision of law authorizing an interrogation of a law enforcement officer to be suspended for 10 days until the officer can obtain representation; requiring a specified representative for a law enforcement officer to be appointed by a specified entity under specified circumstances; and requiring a representative appointed under the Act to represent the law enforcement officer at all times during the investigation unless the representative is replaced or the officer waives the right to counsel.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Reassigned to Judiciary 26
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM