Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegate McDonough
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the earning of diminution credits to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate who is serving a sentence for a specified crime of violence involving a firearm in a State or local correctional facility; eliminating parole eligibility for a person who is serving a term of confinement for a specified crime of violence involving a firearm; prohibiting a person who has been convicted of a specified crime of violence involving a firearm from entering into a plea agreement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0424 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-502, 3-702, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM